U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-03026
  • Case Name: McNeese v. Anderson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.