U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10057
  • Case Name: Lakisha Michelle Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Flags Set-Reset]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Financial Management Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.