U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20356
  • Case Name: Perry Holliday, Sr and Karen Michelle Holliday
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.