U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20177
  • Case Name: John Patrick Weiss
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.