U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20191
  • Case Name: Robert Alan Skiles
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Relief from Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Relief from Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Generic Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.