U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40019
  • Case Name: Jason Emory Bond
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.