U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05007
  • Case Name: Stavig v. Nelnet et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Set (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.