U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20038
  • Case Name: Austin J Tebo and Camilla J Tebo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Financial Management Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.