U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40016
  • Case Name: Duane Scott Bibens and Sandra Lynn Bibens
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Final Financial Management Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.