U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10275
  • Case Name: Samantha Thompson Coty
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Support Document]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Change of Address]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Change of Address]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Change of Address]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employee Income Records]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BK Petition Preparer's Information]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.