U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40024
  • Case Name: Luke Appling Shuttleworth
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Decree]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.