U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-21398
  • Case Name: David Leonard Cloud and Kerrie Lynne Cloud
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Change of Address]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Intended Compromise]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.