U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40800
  • Case Name: Paul Matthew Pool and Elizabeth Catherine Pool
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Final Decree]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.