U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-02019
  • Case Name: Glasgow v. Shasta Beverages, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.