U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10277
  • Case Name: Anthony Michael Williams-Evans and Tyler James Williams-Evans
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.