U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10155
  • Case Name: Corina Shanae Deshazer and Bailey Kay Waring
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.