U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-mj-06076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.