open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00501
    Party Name:Patterson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Fee Refund]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Correction re:PDF]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?112999
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =