U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00410
  • Case Name: Mireles v. Cornerstone Healthcare Group Management Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.