U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Feathers Chicken Farms, LLC v. Westfield Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Filing Official Transcript]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transcript - Court Official]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to Amend]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Deficiency]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.