U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00528
  • Case Name: Henry v. Joe & Mary Bauer Family, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Summons Issued]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.