U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Drennan v. Tractor Supply Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.