U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Hahn v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 01, 2025: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.