U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Porter v. Todd County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.