U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-21443
  • Case Name: Stephen M. Fenn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharge]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Request for Discharge]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.