U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10699
  • Case Name: Dennis P Walsh and Marie B Walsh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
December, 2017
  • December 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.