U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01026
  • Case Name: Stevens v. Yahn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • February 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Show Cause]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Sua Sponte Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.