U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10723
  • Case Name: Regina L Snow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.