U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-02068
  • Case Name: Strong v. D'Appolonia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entry]
  • February 22, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Sua Sponte Order]
  • February 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Acceptance of Service]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.