U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10012
  • Case Name: Constance M Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Statement of Intent]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Document]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Matrix]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.