U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20064
  • Case Name: Barney Alan Hamlin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2018
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Declaration]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Documents]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedule H]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedule C]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Matrix]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.