U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 10-21355
  • Case Name: Normand A Binette, Jr. and Mary J Binette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Final Order re: Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Transcript]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appellee Designation]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appellant Designation]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appeal Transmission Form]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fessenden, Peter C. [Response]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fessenden, Peter C. [Objection]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fessenden, Peter C. [Reopen Chapter 13 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.