U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00121
  • Case Name: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINIST AND AEROSPACE WORKERS DISTRICT LODGE 4 LOCAL LODGE S25 v. JDD INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.