U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10140
  • Case Name: Breda, a Limited Liability Company
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Professional Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Matrix]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.