U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00021
  • Case Name: VARGAS v. UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SYSTEM AT THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN MAINE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.