U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00020
  • Case Name: LOPEZ et al v. RILEY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.