U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10267
  • Case Name: Kimball Paul Jewett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Defer Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Defer Fee]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.