U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00172
  • Case Name: DRESSER et al v. MUNICIPAL REVIEW COMMITTEE INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.