U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00139
  • Case Name: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. LIBERTY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [SEALED Order]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.