U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00240
  • Case Name: FLAHERTY v. UNUM GROUP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 18, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.