U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02008
  • Case Name: Jeffrey T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the v. Seaforth Housing, LLC d/b/a Back Bay Towers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entry]
  • October 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend]
  • September 18, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Consent]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend]
  • September 01, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.