U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00279
  • Case Name: QUINCY et al v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 17, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.