U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10428
  • Case Name: Paige Autumn McKenzie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.