U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00194
  • Case Name: PELLETIER v. BRENNAN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 21, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.