U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00212
  • Case Name: TUCK v. CITY OF GARDINER POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.