U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20508
  • Case Name: Tracy S. McInnis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Avoid or strip Lien]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Change of Address]
September, 2018
  • September 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.