U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00447
  • Case Name: ATKINS-POULIN et al v. EDDIE BAUER LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.