U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00356
  • Case Name: KITCHIN et al v. LIBERTY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.