U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00443
  • Case Name: JOSEPH v. LINCARE INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 10, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Answer Deadline]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.