U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00379
  • Case Name: RAYMOND et al v. MAINE SCHOOL ADMINISTRATIVE DISTRICT 6 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.